Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 996 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 27431 Month
» 260351 Year
» 1925727 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 98 m/e 07/1908
Great Western Railway (1922) 299 4w/e 10/1922

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5098
To Service During 07/1908
Withdrawal Mon 18/06/1951
Service Life 42 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys
Total Mileage 740,519

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 11/08/1951 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1908
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 15/07/1950
     Withdrawn on 18/06/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 15/07/1950
WDN   m/e 30/06/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1908 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 98
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5098
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 299    
15/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
18/06/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 299    
11/08/1951 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev