Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3874 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17917 Week
» 82871 Month
» 285535 Year
» 3312388 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2996 |
06/10/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
07012 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
07 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ruston & Hornsby |
To Service |
06/10/1962 to Southampton Docks (71I) |
Withdrawn |
02/07/1977 |
Time in Service |
14 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys |
Cut Up |
on |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/10/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/10/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2996 Built at Ruston & Hornsby Allocated to Southampton Docks (71I) |
|
|
07/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 07012 |
|
|
31/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
31/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
02/07/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 07012 |
|
|