Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 365 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18168 Week
» 71184 Month
» 190711 Year
» 3217564 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13006 |
27/12/1952 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3006 |
06/07/1957 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/12/1952 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/12/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13006 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
06/07/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3006 |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
07/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
29/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
18/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
01/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
26/11/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3006 from Immingham (40B) |
|
|
08/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|