Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 80 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 80 Week
» 11225 Month
» 111010 Year
» 1776386 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13012 23/12/1952  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3012 27/02/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 08007  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0823/12/1952
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number 232
To Service 23/12/1952 to Hither Green (73C)
Withdrawn 01/01/1973
Time in Service 20 yrs , 9 dys
Cut Up 01/10/1973
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) on 23/12/1952
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 06/11/1954
   Withdrawn on 01/01/1973


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
23/12/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 13012
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
27/02/1960 Renumbered Renumbered to 3012    
1973 Number Allocated Allocated number 08007 but not taken up    
01/01/1973 Withdrawn Condemned as 3012    
01/10/1973 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev