Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 412 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2577 Week
» 2577 Month
» 69439 Year
» 1734815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13013 23/12/1952  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3013 21/06/1958  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0823/12/1952
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number 232
To Service 23/12/1952 to Hither Green (73C)
Withdrawn 01/10/1972
Time in Service 19 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys
Cut Up 01/10/1973
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) on 23/12/1952
71A Eastleigh 8w/e 13/05/1954
   Withdrawn on 01/10/1972


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
23/12/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 13013
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
21/06/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to 3013    
01/10/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as 3013    
01/10/1973 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev