Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 39 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5596 Week
» 16741 Month
» 116526 Year
» 1781902 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13014 24/12/1952  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3014 24/12/1960  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0824/12/1952
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number 232
To Service 24/12/1952 to Hither Green (73C)
Withdrawn 01/10/1972
Time in Service 19 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) on 24/12/1952
71A Eastleigh 8w/e 13/05/1954
75C Norwood Junction 6w/e 05/10/1960
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 05/03/1962
   Withdrawn on 01/10/1972

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
24/12/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 13014
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
05/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
24/12/1960 Renumbered Renumbered to 3014    
05/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
01/10/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as 3014    

prev prev