Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 375 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2540 Week
» 2540 Month
» 69402 Year
» 1734778 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13015 24/01/1953  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3015 09/09/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 08008 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0824/01/1953
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number 232
To Service 24/01/1953 to Willesden (1A)
Withdrawn 27/11/1983 off Gateshead (GD)
Time in Service 30 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys
Cut Up 30/09/1986
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
1A Willesden (New) on 24/01/1953
1B Camden w/e 17/09/1960
1A Willesden w/e 03/01/1966
1E Bletchley w/e 23/05/1970
41A Tinsley w/e 22/07/1972
SB Shirebrook 2w/e 31/08/1974
TI Tinsley 2w/e 04/12/1976
   Withdrawn on 27/11/1983


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
24/01/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 13015
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Willesden (1A)
   
09/09/1960 Renumbered Renumbered to 3015    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
03/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
23/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
22/07/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08008    
31/08/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Shirebrook (SB)    
04/12/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
27/11/1983 Withdrawn Condemned as 08008 from Gateshead (GD)    
30/09/1986 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev