Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2269 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20072 Week
» 73088 Month
» 192615 Year
» 3219468 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13015 |
24/01/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3015 |
09/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08008 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/01/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/01/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13015 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
09/09/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3015 |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
23/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
22/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08008 |
|
|
31/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (SB) |
|
|
04/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
27/11/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08008 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
30/09/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|