Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 75 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 75 Week
» 11220 Month
» 111005 Year
» 1776381 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13016 24/01/1953  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3016 12/1957  
TOPS (Tops) 08009 05/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0824/01/1953
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number 232
To Service 24/01/1953 to Willesden (1A)
Withdrawn 30/11/1975 off Ashford Chart Leacon (AF)
Time in Service 22 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 30/06/1976
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
1A Willesden (New) on 24/01/1953
1B Camden w/e 17/09/1960
1A Willesden w/e 05/11/1960
AF Ashford Chart Leacon w/e 27/04/1974
   Withdrawn on 30/11/1975


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
24/01/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 13016
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Willesden (1A)
   
12/1957 Renumbered Renumbered to 3016    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
27/04/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (AF)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08009    
30/11/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 08009 from Ashford Chart Leacon (AF)    
30/06/1976 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev