Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 767 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6167 Week
» 24219 Month
» 257139 Year
» 1922515 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13021 16/05/1953  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3021 08/02/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 08014 05/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0816/05/1953
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number 232
To Service 16/05/1953 to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)
Withdrawn 18/05/1980 off Bury (BV)
Time in Service 27 yrs , 2 dys
Cut Up 30/11/1981
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
3C Ryecroft (Walsall) (New) on 16/05/1953
2F Bescot w/e 22/04/1967
16A Toton w/e 08/06/1968
   Withdrawn on 18/05/1980


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
16/05/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 13021
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)
   
08/02/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to 3021    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
08/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08014    
18/05/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 08014 from Bury (BV)    
30/11/1981 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev