Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 837 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6237 Week
» 24289 Month
» 257209 Year
» 1922585 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13023 13/06/1953  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3023 02/11/1957  
TOPS (Tops) 08016 02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0813/06/1953
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number 232
To Service 13/06/1953 to Cricklewood East (14A)
Withdrawn 18/05/1980 off Newton Heath (NH)
Time in Service 26 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
14A Cricklewood East (New) on 13/06/1953
2F Bescot w/e 19/08/1967
1E Bletchley w/e 11/05/1968
TO Toton w/e 22/12/1973
NH Newton Heath w/e 09/11/1974
   Withdrawn on 18/05/1980

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
13/06/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 13023
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A)
   
02/11/1957 Renumbered Renumbered to 3023    
19/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
22/12/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (TO)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08016    
09/11/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH)    
18/05/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 08016 from Newton Heath (NH)    

prev prev