Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 4615 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20227 Week
» 118872 Month
» 321536 Year
» 3348389 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13037 |
28/11/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3037 |
27/01/1959 |
At Derby Works |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/11/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/11/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13037 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
27/01/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3037 |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
15/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
17/12/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3037 from Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|