Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 518 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18321 Week
» 71337 Month
» 190864 Year
» 3217717 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13043 |
20/02/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3043 |
23/08/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08031 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 11/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/02/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/02/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13043 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
09/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
23/08/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3043 |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
04/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
08/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (SW) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08031 |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/07/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08031 from Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
30/03/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Rail: at Immingham MPD |
|
|