Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2072 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15478 Week
» 68494 Month
» 188021 Year
» 3214874 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13054 |
17/07/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3054 |
18/01/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08041 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/07/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/07/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13054 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
14/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
18/01/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3054 |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08041 |
|
|
04/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
08/08/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08041 from Bescot (BS) |
|
|
04/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|