27/10/1945 |
Ashford Works |
Locos noted on 27/10 included 0-4-0 Dock Tank 81, 'Jersey,' together with Terrier 2678, both ex-works. The latter has been on loan to. the KESR. 2528 (BTN), 2534 (NHN), 2023/5 (TWW) and 719 (BM) were outside the shed whilst 2072 (NX) was on a down passenger. 1451 with number still on the tender was station pilot. 22 classes in all were represented, excluding those outside the works. |
SLS/194602 |
31/07/1948 |
St. Leonards MPD |
K. & E S.: No. 2640 was at St. Leonards for some days in July, working ballast trains on to the K. & E.S. line, subsequently going on loan; No. 2678 being in Works |
SLS/194809 |
24/04/1949 |
K. & E.S.R. |
On Sunday, April 24th 'Terrier' No. 2678 (ex W14) was restored to the rails by the aid of the Ashford and Brighton cranes-on strengthened track-after having been in a shallow ditch for several weeks, due to a derailment. No. 2644 was sent from West Sussex as a replacement. |
SLS/194906 |
08/10/1949 |
Ashford Works |
On 8/10 no less than three 'Terriers' were on view-No. 32670 (ex K.E.S. 3) in green, unlettered; No. 32678 (ex Brighton Works) lined black, no crest, and No. 2659 in Southern black, shaded lettering. Latest diesel at work was No. 15223, while No. 15224 was in the Paint Shop and No. 15225 (nearly complete) in the Erecting Shop. The Diesel-mechanical locomotive is well on the way and a start has been made on one of the two main line diesels, on order. |
SLS/194911 |
31/10/1949 |
Brighton Section |
No. 32678 (derailed on the K. & E.S.R. earlier in the year) has returned to traffic, painted black and fully lined. No. 2655 was working the Hayling Island branch during September and No. 2659 was on hop-picking specials from St. Leonards and Robertsbridge to Bodiam. 'D.3' No. 32393 is ex Works after heavy repairs and is painted black and fully lined. 'Atlantic' No. 2038 is in store at Eastbourne. |
SLS/194911 |
19/04/1958 |
Wainwright \"D\" |
I was on the footplate of a Wainwright 'D' 4-4-0 in April, 1958, although the class was officially extinct about two years ago. Our friend and member, Mr. W. E. Coney, has had plans and parts ready to restore Ashford-built No. 31737 to S.E.C.R. 737 in the Works there to all her one-time glory but, alas, authority to proceed is so far withheld and the veteran is becoming more rusty and forlorn in the open. In the busy Shops at Ashford new inside cylinders with steam chests, etc., are being turned out for both classes of Pacifics rebuilding at Eastleigh; also new cylinders and front ends for S.R. Moguls continuing to be modified there. ' Schools ' lately painted green include 30908 Westminster, 30927 Clifton. The ' oldest-of-all ' now, No. 32636, 1872-built Stroudley ' Terrier ' once named Fenchurch, sold by the L.B.S.C.R. to the Newhaven Harbour Company in 1898, purchased by the S.R. with the whole undertaking in 1927, is still at work in smart-lined black, shunting at St. Leonards, West Marina & Loco. Yds. or taking the Kent & East Sussex daily freight at the time of writing in Yds., it shared with the slightly younger sister OP '0-6-0T No. 32678 which had been in Isle of Wight stock, one at each end (as at hop-picking passenger time during recent Septembers) in hauling the Branch Line Society's 4-corridor special from Robertsbridge to Tenterden and back, ex-K.E.S.R., on April 12, while our A.G.M. was in progress at H.Q. One little tank alone had rather a struggle on account of priming to get the empty train up the climbs on the direct London line from St. Leonards to Battle at the start of the afternoon. |
SLS/195805 |
31/05/1964 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) |
Works Yard, Waiting Works: 73050, 73083. Works Yard, Ex Works: 34089, 73114. Erecting Shop: 30069, 32640, 32678 Undergoing restoration, 34005, 34018, 34026, 34037, 34042, 34076, 35007, 35019 35022/3, 73052, 73085/9, 76067, 76082, 80016, 80145, 80154, 15218, 15233, 20002, D3041, D3220, D3459, D3667, D6547, D6554. Scrap Yard: 30133 Intact, 34049 Remains, 82008 Intact. |
SLS/196407 |