Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1584 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14990 Week
» 68006 Month
» 187533 Year
» 3214386 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
534 |
m/e |
09/1938 |
British Railways |
30534 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Q |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 09/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 22/12/1962 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 3 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1938 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 534 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tunbridge Wells West (TWW) |
|
|
02/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (TWW) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30534 |
|
|
31/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
03/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
22/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30534 |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|