Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3911 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17317 Week
» 70333 Month
» 189860 Year
» 3216713 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
537 |
m/e |
10/1938 |
British Railways |
30537 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Q |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 10/1938 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/12/1962 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1938 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 537 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED) |
|
|
01/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30537 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
18/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
04/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30537 |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|