|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1947 | General | Owing to the number of TWW 'I.3' 4-4-2T under repair, 'Q' No. 543 and various 4-4-0 are on loan and working TWW passenger turn. | SLS/194705 |
04/11/1961 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D5000/3, D6530, E5008, 3733, 7782, 9629/77, 15211/34, 30051/7, 30480, 30543/7, 30830, 30921, 31808, 32343, 33028/33/40, 34015/49/57/63, 34103/10, 35010/27, 41206, 41324, 73020, 76059, 80145, 82013. Works Yard: 9732, 15233, 30120, 30859/, 34037/50/99, 76060/8, 92211. Scrap Yard: 30277, 30858, 31145, 31505. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/03/1939 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 543 Built at Eastleigh Works Allocated to Guildford (GFD) |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Horsham (HOR) | ||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 30543 | ||
09/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
17/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D) | ||
07/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) | ||
06/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
25/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (75B) | ||
20/12/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 30543 | ||
05/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |