Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 2762 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16168 Week
» 69184 Month
» 188711 Year
» 3215564 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
South Eastern Railway |
383 |
m/e |
09/1893 |
Southern Railway (1923) |
A383 |
y/e |
1923 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1383 |
y/e |
1931 |
British Railways |
31383 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Stirling / H. Wainwright |
Class |
O1 |
Company History |
SR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3950 |
To Service |
During 09/1893 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/04/1951 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
3w/e |
30/11/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/04/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/03/1950 |
\"O.1\" Class |
Nos. 1373, 31383 an 31425 are to remain in service at Dover for working on the former East Kent Rly., while the remaining twenty are to be stored, as and from 25/3/50, at the following depots: Ashford, Dover, Faversham, Hither Green, New Cross Gate, Ramsgate and Tonbridge. |
SLS/195004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1893 |
To Service |
To service as South Eastern Railway Number 383 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 3950 |
|
|
1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to A383 |
|
|
1931 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1383 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - East Kent Railway (EKR) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31383 |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/04/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31383 |
|
|