Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3628 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17034 Week
» 70050 Month
» 189577 Year
» 3216430 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
South Eastern Railway |
48 |
m/e |
12/1893 |
Southern Railway (1923) |
A48 |
y/e |
1923 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1048 |
y/e |
1931 |
British Railways |
31048 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Stirling / H. Wainwright |
Class |
O1 |
Company History |
SR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 12/1893 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/10/1960 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 10 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1893 |
To Service |
To service as South Eastern Railway Number 48 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to A48 |
|
|
1931 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1048 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31048 |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
09/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H) |
|
|
10/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
15/10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31048 |
|
|