Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 106 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3619 Week
» 23912 Month
» 201816 Year
» 1867192 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
South Eastern Railway 65 m/e 09/1896
Southern Railway (1923) A65 y/e 1923
Southern Railway (1931) 1065 y/e 1931
British Railways 31065 y/e 1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Stirling / H. Wainwright
Class O1
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O09/1896
O1 (0-6-0)09/1908
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 09/1896
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/06/1961
Service Life 64 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1896
DOV   Dover Marine on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74A   Ashford 4w/e 27/07/1951
74C   Dover Marine 6w/e 18/06/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 24/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 74A Ashford 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 6w/e 22/06/1954
WDN   w/e 24/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1896 To Service To service as South Eastern Railway Number 65
Built at Ashford Works
   
1923 Renumbered Renumbered to A65    
1931 Renumbered Renumbered to 1065    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 31065    
18/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
24/06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31065    

prev prev