Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 325 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18128 Week
» 71144 Month
» 190671 Year
» 3217524 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
South Eastern Railway |
251 |
m/e |
11/1896 |
Southern Railway (1923) |
A251 |
y/e |
1923 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1251 |
y/e |
1931 |
British Railways |
31258 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Stirling / H. Wainwright |
Class |
O1 |
Company History |
SR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 11/1896 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1961 |
Service Life |
64 yrs , 3 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1896 |
To Service |
To service as South Eastern Railway Number 251 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to A251 |
|
|
1931 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1251 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31258 |
|
|
27/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
19/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31258 |
|
|
02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|