Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1360 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19163 Week
» 72179 Month
» 191706 Year
» 3218559 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
South Eastern Railway |
425 |
m/e |
08/1897 |
Southern Railway (1923) |
A425 |
y/e |
1923 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1425 |
y/e |
1931 |
British Railways |
31425 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Stirling / H. Wainwright |
Class |
O1 |
Company History |
SR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4302 |
To Service |
During 08/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/08/1959 |
Service Life |
62 yrs , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1897 |
BA |
|
Bricklayers Arms |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
DOV |
|
Dover Marine |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/03/1950 |
\"O.1\" Class |
Nos. 1373, 31383 an 31425 are to remain in service at Dover for working on the former East Kent Rly., while the remaining twenty are to be stored, as and from 25/3/50, at the following depots: Ashford, Dover, Faversham, Hither Green, New Cross Gate, Ramsgate and Tonbridge. |
SLS/195004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1897 |
To Service |
To service as South Eastern Railway Number 425 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4302 |
|
|
1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to A425 |
|
|
1931 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1425 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31425 |
|
|
12/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (DOV) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31425 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|