Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 542 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18345 Week
» 71361 Month
» 190888 Year
» 3217741 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
South Eastern Railway |
430 |
m/e |
09/1897 |
Southern Railway (1923) |
A430 |
y/e |
1923 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1430 |
y/e |
1931 |
British Railways |
31430 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Stirling / H. Wainwright |
Class |
O1 |
Company History |
SR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4307 |
To Service |
During 09/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/05/1959 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1947 |
Ashford Works |
Locos. entering works during February included: 1041, 1066. 1090, 1158, 1162, 1234, 1265, 1337, 1430, 1481, 1558, 2306, 2309, 2357, 2384, 2405, 2407, 2408, 2465, 2524, 2538, and 2589. |
SLS/194704 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1897 |
To Service |
To service as South Eastern Railway Number 430 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4307 |
|
|
1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to A430 |
|
|
1931 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1430 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31430 |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
16/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31430 |
|
|
06/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|