Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 91 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6018 Week
» 4756 Month
» 419077 Year
» 1640642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13076 23/01/1954  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3076 22/02/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 08062 02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0823/01/1954
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 23/01/1954 to Hull Dairycoates (53A)
Withdrawn 30/09/1984
Time in Service 30 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys
Cut Up 23/03/1985
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
53A Hull Dairycoates (New) on 23/01/1954
52G Sunderland w/e 08/04/1961
52A Gateshead w/e 26/08/1961
50A York (North) w/e 22/06/1963
   Withdrawn on 30/09/1984


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
23/01/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 13076
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)
   
22/02/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to 3076 (Pre Tops)    
08/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
26/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08062 (Tops)    
30/09/1984 Withdrawn      
23/03/1985 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev