Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3240 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16646 Week
» 69662 Month
» 189189 Year
» 3216042 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13080 |
20/02/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3080 |
19/04/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08065 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/02/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/02/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13080 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3080 |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
11/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
15/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08065 |
|
|
04/09/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08065 from Immingham (IM) |
|
|
11/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|