Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1481 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19284 Week
» 72300 Month
» 191827 Year
» 3218680 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13089 |
04/12/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3089 |
01/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08074 |
08/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
04/12/1954 to Speke Junction (8C) |
Withdrawn |
09/12/1973 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs , 5 dys |
Cut Up |
06/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Derby) |
Information |
This locomotive was renumbered after withdrawal! It was used a source of spares at Polmadie depot and was renumbered at least 8 months after it left capital stock. |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 12/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/12/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/12/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13089 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (24K) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
01/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3089 |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
20/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
09/12/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3089 |
|
|
08/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08074 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|