Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 21 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4648 Week
» 6386 Month
» 133829 Year
» 1799205 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13089 04/12/1954  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3089 01/1959  
TOPS (Tops) 08074 08/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0804/12/1954
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 04/12/1954 to Speke Junction (8C)
Withdrawn 09/12/1973
Time in Service 19 yrs , 5 dys
Cut Up 01/06/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Derby)
Information This locomotive was renumbered after withdrawal! It was used a source of spares at Polmadie depot and was renumbered at least 8 months after it left capital stock.
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
8C Speke Junction (New) on 04/12/1954
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 25/02/1956
8C Speke Junction 4w/e 24/03/1956
5B Crewe South 4w/e 01/12/1956
24K Preston 4w/e 04/10/1958
5B Crewe South w/e 01/11/1958
2B Nuneaton w/e 10/06/1961
21E Monument Lane w/e 20/01/1962
2F Bescot w/e 22/04/1967
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/05/1968
   Withdrawn on 09/12/1973


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
04/12/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 13089
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Speke Junction (8C)
   
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (24K)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
01/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to 3089    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
20/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
09/12/1973 Withdrawn Condemned as 3089    
08/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08074    
01/06/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    

prev prev