Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2920 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16326 Week
» 69342 Month
» 188869 Year
» 3215722 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13095 |
18/12/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3095 |
21/03/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/12/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/12/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13095 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
11/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3095 |
|
|
01/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
01/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
21/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
30/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F) |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F) |
|
|
31/05/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3095 |
|
|
12/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|