Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2686 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16092 Week
» 69108 Month
» 188635 Year
» 3215488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
108 |
m/e |
09/1910 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
310 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
Great Western Railway (1946) |
203 |
on |
10/12/1948 (At Caerphilly Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
O4 |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2536 |
To Service |
During 09/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/01/1952 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys |
Total Mileage |
654,691 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1910 |
CDF |
|
Cardiff Canton |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/01/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 108 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2536 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 310 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
10/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 203 |
|
|
07/01/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 203 |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|