Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 304 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4281 Week
» 15518 Month
» 248438 Year
» 1913814 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 108 m/e 09/1910
Great Western Railway (1922) 310 4w/e 10/1922
Great Western Railway (1946) 203 on 10/12/1948 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2536
To Service During 09/1910
Withdrawal Mon 07/01/1952
Service Life 41 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys
Total Mileage 654,691

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 24/01/1953 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1910
     Withdrawn on 07/01/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   m/e 31/01/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1910 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 108
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2536
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 310    
10/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 203    
07/01/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 203    
24/01/1953 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev