Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1285 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19088 Week
» 72104 Month
» 191631 Year
» 3218484 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13101 |
05/02/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3101 |
12/12/1958 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
05/02/1955 to Norwood Junction (75C) |
Withdrawn |
31/05/1972 |
Time in Service |
17 yrs, 3 mths , 26 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/02/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/02/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13101 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
20/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
12/12/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3101 |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
07/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
31/05/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3101 |
|
|