Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 20 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4647 Week
» 6385 Month
» 133828 Year
» 1799204 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13109 16/03/1955  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3109 31/10/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 08084 04/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0816/03/1955
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 16/03/1955 to Banbury (84C)
Withdrawn 02/11/1980 off Newton Heath (NH)
Time in Service 25 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys
Cut Up 01/02/1982
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
84C Banbury (New) on 16/03/1955
2A Tyseley w/e 08/10/1966
8C Speke Junction w/e 07/10/1967
8J Allerton w/e 11/05/1968
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 22/07/1972
NH Newton Heath 3w/e 06/10/1973
   Withdrawn on 02/11/1980


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
16/03/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 13109
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Banbury (84C)
   
31/10/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to 3109    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
22/07/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08084    
02/11/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 08084 from Newton Heath (NH)    
01/02/1982 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev