Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 15 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2090 Week
» 27451 Month
» 260371 Year
» 1925747 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 109 m/e 09/1910
Great Western Railway (1922) 311 4w/e 10/1922
Great Western Railway (1946) 204 on 27/08/1947 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2537
To Service During 09/1910
Withdrawal Tue 26/07/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys
Total Mileage 659,613

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 10/09/1955 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1910
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 25/11/1953
     Withdrawn on 26/07/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 28/11/1953
WDN   m/e 31/07/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1910 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 109
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2537
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 311    
27/08/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 204    
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
26/07/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 204    
10/09/1955 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev