Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1483 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19286 Week
» 72302 Month
» 191829 Year
» 3218682 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
109 |
m/e |
09/1910 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
311 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
Great Western Railway (1946) |
204 |
on |
27/08/1947 (At Caerphilly Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
O4 |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2537 |
To Service |
During 09/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 26/07/1955 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys |
Total Mileage |
659,613 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1910 |
ABDR |
|
Aberdare |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88B |
|
Cardiff East Dock |
4w/e |
25/11/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/07/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 109 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2537 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 311 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aberdare (ABDR) |
|
|
27/08/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 204 |
|
|
25/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
26/07/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 204 |
|
|
10/09/1955 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|