Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2063 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19866 Week
» 72882 Month
» 192409 Year
» 3219262 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13110 |
22/03/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3110 |
02/03/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
TOPS (Tops) |
08085 |
06/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/03/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/03/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13110 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
02/03/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3110 |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (2A) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08085 |
|
|
23/03/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08085 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
16/04/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|