Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 302 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4279 Week
» 15516 Month
» 248436 Year
» 1913812 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 110 m/e 09/1910
Great Western Railway (1922) 313 4w/e 10/1922
Great Western Railway (1946) 205 on 05/07/1947 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2538
To Service During 09/1910
Withdrawal Mon 12/07/1954
Service Life 43 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys
Total Mileage 703,603
Information Sent to Worcester for stationary boiler purposes 13/2/1956. Returned to Swindon Factory 'C' shop 30/3/1957

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 20/04/1957 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1910
     Withdrawn on 12/07/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   m/e 31/07/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1910 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 110
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2538
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 313    
05/07/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 205    
12/07/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 205    
20/04/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev