Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1503 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15546 Week
» 80500 Month
» 283164 Year
» 3310017 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13134 |
30/10/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3134 |
25/05/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08099 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/10/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/10/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13134 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
25/05/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3134 |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
20/06/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08099 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (FH) |
|
|
07/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (BG) |
|
|
12/09/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08099 from Hull Botanic Gardens (BG) |
|
|
15/10/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|