Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 33 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2108 Week
» 27469 Month
» 260389 Year
» 1925765 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 112 m/e 10/1910
Great Western Railway (1922) 315 4w/e 10/1922
Great Western Railway (1946) 207 on 27/10/1947 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5386
To Service During 10/1910
Withdrawal Tue 18/11/1952
Service Life 42 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys
Total Mileage 649,929

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 31/10/1953 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1910
     Withdrawn on 15/12/1945
THT   Treherbert m/e 30/06/1948
FDL   Ferndale 4w/e 07/08/1948
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 20/05/1950
     Withdrawn on 18/11/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC THT Treherbert m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC FDL Ferndale 4w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 20/05/1950
WDN   m/e 30/11/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during Nov. included: Nos. 905, 1001, 1010, 1413, 1450, 1713, 1799, 2327, 2722, 2781, 2838, 2864, 2868, 2927, 2941, 2979, 3186, 3383, 3817, 3834, 3852, 4039, 4056, 4058, 4073, 4088, 4089, 4919, 4925, 4969, 4979, 4995, 5008, 5042, 5070, 5078, 5336, 5355, 6115, 6136, 7311, W.D. 77291, 77393, 77508, 79278. Of these, 77291/393 and 79238 are ex Marston Sidings and repair in Belgium, and 77508/79278 are fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots during November have included Nos. 242, 905, 1713 an 2781. 'Star' Class No. 4054 EXE was ex Works on 8/11, having been lined out. W.D. No. 78542 GLO was ex Works on 12/11. This is another loco. fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Locos. which have been condemned during November are: Nos. 200, 207, 898, 2783 an 3007. SLS/194801

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1910 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 112
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5386
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 315    
27/10/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 207    
30/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (THT)    
07/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Ferndale (FDL)    
20/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
18/11/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 207    
31/10/1953 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev