Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 4 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2079 Week
» 27440 Month
» 260360 Year
» 1925736 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 113 m/e 10/1910
Great Western Railway (1922) 317 4w/e 10/1922
Great Western Railway (1946) 208 on 04/08/1948 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5387
To Service During 10/1910
Withdrawal Fri 22/07/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 9 mths , 22 dys
Total Mileage 735,416

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 08/10/1955 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1910
86J   Aberdare 4w/e 29/11/1952
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 22/05/1954
     Withdrawn on 22/07/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 22/05/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1910 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 113
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5387
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 317    
04/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 208    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
22/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
22/07/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 208    
08/10/1955 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev