Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2156 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19959 Week
» 72975 Month
» 192502 Year
» 3219355 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13177 |
30/09/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3177 |
23/08/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08111 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/09/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/09/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13177 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
23/08/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3177 |
|
|
22/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08111 |
|
|
13/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (WS) |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
19/06/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (WS) |
|
|
12/1976 |
To Store |
To Store (Gloucester) |
|
|
04/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|
01/04/1979 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08111 from Frodingham (FH) |
|
|