Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1326 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19129 Week
» 72145 Month
» 191672 Year
» 3218525 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13180 |
18/10/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3180 |
31/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08114 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
18/10/1955 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
06/11/1983 off Doncaster (DR) |
Time in Service |
28 yrs , 19 dys |
Cut Up |
18/08/1984 |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/10/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/10/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13180 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
31/12/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3180 |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08114 |
|
|
06/11/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08114 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
18/08/1984 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|