Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 479 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19390 Week
» 84344 Month
» 287008 Year
» 3313861 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13188 |
09/11/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3188 |
05/10/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
TOPS (Tops) |
08121 |
10/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1970 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
10/10/1970 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/11/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
09/1970 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
10/10/1970 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/11/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13188 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Tondu (86F) |
|
|
05/10/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3188 |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
09/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
13/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
21/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
10/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08121 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
10/06/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08121 from Allerton (AN) |
|
|
16/11/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|