Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 24 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2099 Week
» 27460 Month
» 260380 Year
» 1925756 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 115 m/e 10/1910
Great Western Railway (1922) 319 4w/e 10/1922
Great Western Railway (1946) 210 on 03/12/1947 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5389
To Service During 10/1910
Withdrawal Fri 04/03/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys
Total Mileage 718,902

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 21/05/1955 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1910
THT   Treherbert 4w/e 29/01/1949
88B   Cardiff East Dock 3w/e 17/05/1952
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 04/10/1952
88C   Barry 4w/e 21/03/1953
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 26/12/1953
     Withdrawn on 04/03/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC THT Treherbert 4w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 26/12/1953
WDN   m/e 31/03/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1910 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 115
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5389
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 319    
03/12/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 210    
29/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (THT)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
04/03/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 210    
21/05/1955 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev