Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 268 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4245 Week
» 15482 Month
» 248402 Year
» 1913778 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 116 m/e 10/1910
Great Western Railway (1922) 320 4w/e 10/1922
Great Western Railway (1946) 211 on 04/05/1948 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5390
To Service During 10/1910
Withdrawal Tue 03/05/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys
Total Mileage 753,715

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 19/05/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1910
CVDLIS     8w/e 23/03/1946
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 23/02/1952
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 04/10/1952
     Withdrawn on 03/05/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MTHR Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 23/03/1946
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   m/e 31/05/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1948 Caerphilly Works On 2/4 the following locomotives were noted in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 64, 72, 270, 320/21, 390, 3103/89, 3712, 4134, 4256/63/93/98, 4404, 5114, 5223, 5635/58/68/80, 6661 an 8796, while outside were observed Nos. 190, 3178, 4238/52, 5219, 5549 an 5649. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1910 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 116
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5390
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 320    
23/03/1946 Allocation      
04/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 211    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
03/05/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 211    
19/05/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev