Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1224 Today
» 5975 Yesterday
» 7199 Week
» 105844 Month
» 308508 Year
» 3335361 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3207 |
on |
25/10/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
2251 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
360 |
To Service |
Wed 25/10/1946 to Machynlleth (MCH) |
Withdrawal |
Wed 05/12/1962 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/12/1963 |
Worcester Works (In store at shed) |
1000, 2232, 4978, 6956, 7002, 41535. In store at shed: 3207, 5022, 7023/31. Great Bridge: (5930 and 7007 were removed to Great Bridge for scrap on 5th December). |
SLS/196401 |
11/01/1964 |
Worcester Works (In store awaiting scrap) |
1024 (82C), 2232 (85A), 6954 (82B), 6981 (82B), 9490 (85A), 44691 (2E), D2123 (85A). In store awaiting scrap: 3207, 5022, 5205, 6807, 6948, 7000/31, W20, W23 an W26. |
SLS/196402 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/10/1946 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3207 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Machynlleth (MCH) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (84K) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
05/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3207 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|