Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 984 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2058 Week
» 27419 Month
» 260339 Year
» 1925715 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 118 m/e 10/1910
Great Western Railway (1922) 321 4w/e 10/1922
Great Western Railway (1946) 215 on 14/04/1948 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5391
To Service During 10/1910
Withdrawal Sat 23/07/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys
Total Mileage 739,825

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 05/11/1955 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1910
     Withdrawn on 23/07/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 03/10/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1948 Caerphilly Works On 2/4 the following locomotives were noted in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 64, 72, 270, 320/21, 390, 3103/89, 3712, 4134, 4256/63/93/98, 4404, 5114, 5223, 5635/58/68/80, 6661 an 8796, while outside were observed Nos. 190, 3178, 4238/52, 5219, 5549 an 5649. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1910 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 118
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5391
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 321    
14/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 215    
23/07/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 215    
05/11/1955 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev