Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1029 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24660 Week
» 89614 Month
» 292278 Year
» 3319131 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13213 |
05/03/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3213 |
30/04/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08145 |
09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/03/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/03/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13213 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3213 |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
30/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
30/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
01/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08145 |
|
|
29/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (GM) |
|
|
03/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (DT) |
|
|
12/12/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08145 from Dunfermline Townhill (DT) |
|
|
08/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|