Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 29 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2104 Week
» 27465 Month
» 260385 Year
» 1925761 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 3219 on 30/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 2251
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 360
To Service Mon 30/01/1948
Withdrawal Mon 02/12/1963
Service Life 15 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 30/01/1948
81D   Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 25/11/1953
84D   Leamington 4w/e 28/01/1961
81D   Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 25/02/1961
     Withdrawn on 02/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW UNK   m/e 31/01/1948
1STALLOC WOS Worcester m/e 29/02/1948
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 28/01/1961
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 25/02/1961
WDN   4w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/01/1948 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 3219
Built at Swindon Works
   
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
25/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
02/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 3219    
04/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev