Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1235 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19038 Week
» 72054 Month
» 191581 Year
» 3218434 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13222 |
08/06/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3222 |
26/04/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08154 |
12/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/06/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
08/06/1955 |
Power Unit IH3402 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/06/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13222 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
26/04/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3222 |
|
|
14/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
02/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08154 |
|
|
13/10/1979 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08154 from Selhurst (SU) |
|
|
03/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|